TN HB2104 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-15 - Placed behind the budget
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-15 - Placed behind the budget
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates the Tennessee violence intervention program within the department's office of criminal justice programs to invest in evidence-based violence reduction initiatives. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 38, Chapter 6; Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
As introduced, creates the Tennessee violence intervention program within the department's office of criminal justice programs to invest in evidence-based violence reduction initiatives. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 38, Chapter 6; Title 39 and Title 40.
Sponsors
Rep. Harold Love [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-15 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2020-06-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-11 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/10/2020 |
2020-06-08 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-06-08 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 6/8/2020 |
2020-06-02 | House | Action def. in Judiciary Committee to 6/9/2020 |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 6/2/2020 |
2020-05-27 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 5/27/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2020-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2020-02-03 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2046 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee