TN HB2101 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-30 - Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-30 - Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a court that makes mental health adjudications regarding children to enter a standing and continuing order instructing the juvenile court clerk to collect and report certain information regarding children who have been adjudicated as a mental defective or judicially committed to a mental institution within three business days for the purposes of complying with federal law. - Amends TCA Title 16; Title 33; Title 34; Title 37; Title 38 and Title 39.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 16; Title 33; Title 34; Title 37; Title 38 and Title 39, relative to juveniles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-29 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2024-01-25 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2817 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee