TN HB2098 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-12 - Action Def. in Agriculture Committee to 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-12 - Action Def. in Agriculture Committee to 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Genetically Engineered Food Labeling Act of 2009." - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18, Part 1 and Title 53, Chapter 1.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Genetically Engineered Food Labeling Act of 2009." - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18, Part 1 and Title 53, Chapter 1.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Towns [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-12 | Action Def. in Agriculture Committee to 2010 | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on cal. Agriculture Committee for 05/12/2009 | |
2009-04-28 | Action Def. in Agriculture Committee to 5/12/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on cal. Agriculture Committee for 04/28/2009 | |
2009-04-21 | Action Def. in Agriculture Committee to 4/28/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on cal. Agriculture Committee for 04/21/2009 | |
2009-03-04 | P2C, ref. to Agriculture--Government Operations for review | |
2009-03-02 | P1C. | |
2009-02-26 | Intro. | |
2009-02-25 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0991 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-23 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. C,L&A Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2098&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB2098.pdf |