TN HB2097 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires state regulatory boards within the department of commerce and insurance and state health related boards within the department of health to issue advisory opinions upon request. - Amends TCA Title 62 and Title 63.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 62 and Title 63, relative to advisory opinions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-04-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2024 |
2024-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2024 |
2024-04-08 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/8/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/13/2024 |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2024-01-29 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee - Government Operations for Review |
2024-01-25 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2588 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-25 - Transmitted to Governor for action.