TN HB2097 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-08 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-08 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the attorney general and reporter, on behalf of state entities which it represents in lawsuits involving constitutional questions or sums in excess of $1 million or more, to notify the governor, each speaker of the general assembly, and certain committees and members of the general assembly. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 8 and Title 29, Chapter 20.
Title
As introduced, requires the attorney general and reporter, on behalf of state entities which it represents in lawsuits involving constitutional questions or sums in excess of $1 million or more, to notify the governor, each speaker of the general assembly, and certain committees and members of the general assembly. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 8 and Title 29, Chapter 20.
Sponsors
Rep. Justin Lafferty [R] | Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] | Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] | Rep. Iris Rudder [R] |
Rep. Lowell Russell [R] | Rep. Robin Smith [R] | Rep. Martin Daniel [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-08 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-06-03 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-06-03 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-06-03 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0717) |
2020-05-29 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/2/2020 |
2020-05-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/29/2020 |
2020-05-26 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 5/26/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Action def. in Judiciary Committee to 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Action def. in Judiciary Committee to 3/11/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2020-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2020-02-03 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2740 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee