TN HB2093 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-27 - Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-27 - Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires that, beginning with the 2017–2018 academic year, the cost of producing an associate or baccalaureate degree at a public institution of higher education not exceed the United States average cost of producing an associate or baccalaureate degree respectively as determined by the national center for higher education management systems. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 7; Title 49, Chapter 8 and Title 49, Chapter 9.
Title
As introduced, requires that, beginning with the 2017–2018 academic year, the cost of producing an associate or baccalaureate degree at a public institution of higher education not exceed the United States average cost of producing an associate or baccalaureate degree respectively as determined by the national center for higher education management systems. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 7; Title 49, Chapter 8 and Title 49, Chapter 9.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2016-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2016-01-25 | House | P1C. |
2016-01-21 | House | Intro. |
2016-01-20 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2082 (Crossfiled) 2016-01-25 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2093&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB2093.pdf |