TN HB2072 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-30 - Assigned to s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-30 - Assigned to s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a description of real property by metes and bounds contained within any deed of conveyance of real property of any property not previously described in a recorded instrument to be prepared by a registered land surveyor. - Amends TCA Title 62 and Title 66, Chapter 5, Part 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 62 and Title 66, Chapter 5, Part 1, relative to surveyors.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Hicks [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee |
2024-01-29 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2024-01-25 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2692 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-05 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee