TN HB2070 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 679
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 679
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the department, on or before January 1, 2025, and on or before January 1 of each subsequent year, to submit a report on the department's progress on passenger and freight rail and public transportation efforts at the state and federal levels to the transportation committee of the house of representatives and the transportation and safety committee of the senate, the chief clerk of each house of the general assembly, and the legislative librarian. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 54, Chapter 1; Title 64 and Title 65.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 54, Chapter 1; Title 64 and Title 65, relative to transportation.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Powell [D] | Rep. John Clemmons [D] | Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D] | Rep. Sam Whitson [R] |
Rep. Yusuf Hakeem [D] | Rep. John Crawford [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Caleb Hemmer [D] |
Rep. Bo Mitchell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 679 | |
2024-03-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-25 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-03-21 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/25/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/21/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/6/2024 |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2024-01-29 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2024-01-25 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1807 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-17 - Effective date(s) 04/11/2024