TN HB2065 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 41-12)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 735
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 41-12)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 735
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes an owner or lessee of a motor vehicle who is deaf or hard of hearing to request that the department of safety include such designation in the Tennessee Vehicle Title and Registration System (VTRS) database; enacts other related provisions in regard to such designation. - Amends TCA Title 55.
Title
As enacted, authorizes an owner or lessee of a motor vehicle who is deaf or hard of hearing to request that the department of safety include such designation in the Tennessee Vehicle Title and Registration System (VTRS) database; enacts other related provisions in regard to such designation. - Amends TCA Title 55.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 735 | |
2018-03-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-29 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-03-22 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/29/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/22/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-06 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2018-02-05 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2018-02-05 | House | Sponsor change. |
2018-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2018-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-30 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2023 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 735