TN SB2023 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 735
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 735
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes an owner or lessee of a motor vehicle who is deaf or hard of hearing to request that the department of safety include such designation in the Tennessee Vehicle Title and Registration System (VTRS) database; enacts other related provisions in regard to such designation. - Amends TCA Title 55.
Title
As enacted, authorizes an owner or lessee of a motor vehicle who is deaf or hard of hearing to request that the department of safety include such designation in the Tennessee Vehicle Title and Registration System (VTRS) database; enacts other related provisions in regard to such designation. - Amends TCA Title 55.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 2 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - Senate - SENATE TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - Senate - SENATE TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Pub. Ch. 735 | |
2018-04-23 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2018 | |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-04-05 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 (Amendment 2 - HA0975) |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/4/2018 |
2018-03-29 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-03-29 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0975) |
2018-03-29 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0779) |
2018-03-29 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2018-03-22 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0677) |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/19/2018 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/15/2018 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 3/15/18 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/12/2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2065 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 735