TN HB2056 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 866
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 866
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes certain requirements for solar power facility agreements. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 65; Title 66, Chapter 9, Part 2 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 65; Title 66, Chapter 9, Part 2 and Title 68, relative to solar energy.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Hurt [R] | Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] | Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] | Rep. Johnny Shaw [D] |
Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Rusty Grills [R] | Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Jerome Moon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 866 | |
2022-03-28 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-03-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-24 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/28/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/24/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2022-03-02 | House | Ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2022-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-27 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1925 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Effective date(s) 06/01/2022