TN HB2056 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-25 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee of Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-25 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee of Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a governmental entity with authority to levy a real property tax to include on any real property tax notice issued by the entity for property located in a flood zone a statement to that effect on the tax notice issued to the taxpayer. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5.
Title
As introduced, requires a governmental entity with authority to levy a real property tax to include on any real property tax notice issued by the entity for property located in a flood zone a statement to that effect on the tax notice issued to the taxpayer. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee of Local Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee |
2020-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2020-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2752 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee