TN HB2033 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 729
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 729
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes a domestic abuse victim to request that a court issue an order directing a wireless telephone service provider to transfer the billing responsibility for and rights to the wireless telephone number or numbers to the petitioner; enacts other related provisions. - Amends amend TCA Title 36, Chapter 3, Part 6.
Title
As enacted, authorizes a domestic abuse victim to request that a court issue an order directing a wireless telephone service provider to transfer the billing responsibility for and rights to the wireless telephone number or numbers to the petitioner; enacts other related provisions. - Amends amend TCA Title 36, Chapter 3, Part 6.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Coley [R] | Rep. Mary Littleton [R] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
Rep. Martin Daniel [R] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] | Rep. John Crawford [R] | Rep. Sheila Butt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 729 | |
2018-04-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-02 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-03-29 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/2/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/29/2018 |
2018-03-20 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-19 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2018-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-30 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1796 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 729