TN HB2032 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-30 - Taken off notice for cal. in Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-30 - Taken off notice for cal. in Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the board of dentistry to make semi-annual reports, instead of an annual report, of its proceedings and activities to the governor, with copies to be made available to any interested parties. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 63, Chapter 5, relative to dentistry.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Health Committee |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-22 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-15 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2022-03-07 | House | Ref. to Health Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2022-01-27 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2026 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-23 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 1