TN HB2021 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 772
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "U.S. Attorney General Edwin Meese Civil Asset Forfeiture Reform Act." - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 33, Part 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, enacts the "U.S. Attorney General Edwin Meese Civil Asset Forfeiture Reform Act." - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 33, Part 2.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23 Pub. Ch. 772
2018-04-23 Effective date(s) 10/01/2018; 01/01/2019
2018-04-19 Signed by Governor.
2018-04-10HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2018-04-10SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-04-09HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-04-06HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2018-04-05SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2018-04-05SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0865)
2018-04-05SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2018-04-05SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2018-04-04HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2018-04-04HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-04-04HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 0
2018-04-04HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0889)
2018-03-29HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-03-29HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/4/2018
2018-03-28HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/29/2018
2018-03-27HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2018-03-21HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/27/2018
2018-03-21HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-03-14HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/21/2018
2018-03-14HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2018-03-14HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-03-07HousePlaced on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/14/2018
2018-03-06HouseRec. for pass; ref to Criminal Justice Committee
2018-02-28HousePlaced on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/6/2018
2018-02-28HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2018-02-21HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/28/2018
2018-02-05HouseAssigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
2018-02-01HouseP2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee-- Criminal Justice
2018-01-31HouseIntro., P1C.
2018-01-30HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1987 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 772

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback