TN SB1987 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 772
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 772
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises laws governing civil asset forfeiture. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 33, Part 2.
Title
As enacted, revises laws governing civil asset forfeiture. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 33, Part 2.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 772 | |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/5/2018 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/7/2018 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/7/2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/6/2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. Judiciary Comm. 3-6-18 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2021 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 772