TN HB2018 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Corrections Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Corrections Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, entitles county jails to reimbursement of certain expenses incurred for detaining or housing state parolees waiting for parole revocation hearings. - Amends TCA Title 41, Chapter 11.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 41, Chapter 11, relative to reimbursement of imprisonment expenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Corrections Subcommittee of State Government Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Corrections Subcommittee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-22 | House | Action Def. in s/c Corrections Subcommittee to 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Corrections Subcommittee for 2/22/2022 |
2022-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Corrections Subcommittee |
2022-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2347 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Committee