TN HB2013 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Failed in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee of Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Failed in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee of Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a county governing body that levies a privilege tax on residential development under the County Powers Relief Act to post the administrative guidelines, procedures, regulations, and forms to the county's website. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 29.
Title
As introduced, requires a county governing body that levies a privilege tax on residential development under the County Powers Relief Act to post the administrative guidelines, procedures, regulations, and forms to the county's website. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 29.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Failed in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee of Local Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee |
2020-02-26 | House | Ref. to Local Committee |
2020-02-03 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2020-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2908 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee