TN HB2011 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes a formal process by which a person may file a complaint with the state election commission alleging malfeasance or neglect of duty by a member of the state election commission or a county election commission. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 11 and Title 2, Chapter 12.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, Chapter 11 and Title 2, Chapter 12, relative to citizen appeals to the state election commission.
Sponsors
Rep. Glen Casada [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | House | Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Government Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Action Def. in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee to 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2022-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2877 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee