TN HB2003 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 989
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 989
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that it is not a violation of a "red alone or stop" signal unless the front tires of a vehicle cross the stop line after the signal is red.
Title
As enacted, specifies that it is not a violation of a "red alone or stop" signal unless the front tires of a vehicle cross the stop line after the signal is red.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) TRANSPORTATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Transportation Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) TRANSPORTATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Transportation Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | House | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 989 |
2014-04-16 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2014-04-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2014 |
2014-04-15 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-08 | House | Action Def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to Next Calendar |
2014-04-08 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/8/2014 |
2014-04-08 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 4/8/2014 |
2014-03-25 | House | No action taken |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/25/2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/19/2014 |
2014-02-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2014-01-29 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2014-01-27 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-23 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2056 (Crossfiled) 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 989