TN HB1976 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 733
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 733
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, gives the state board of education administrative subpoena power in connection with investigations related to licensure disciplinary actions. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 3 and Title 49, Chapter 5.
Title
As enacted, gives the state board of education administrative subpoena power in connection with investigations related to licensure disciplinary actions. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 3 and Title 49, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Bill Dunn [R] | Rep. John DeBerry [D] | Rep. Kirk Haston [R] |
Rep. Iris Rudder [R] | Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] | Rep. Chris Hurt [R] | Rep. Tom Leatherwood [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - House - HOUSE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee with Negative Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 733 | |
2020-06-16 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2020-06-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/11/2020 |
2020-06-09 | House | Ref to Calendar & Rules Committee with negative recommendation |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 6/9/2020 |
2020-05-28 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Government Operations Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 5/28/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Action def. in Education Committee to 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Action def. in Education Committee to 3/11/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2020-01-30 | House | P2C, ref. to Education-- Government Operations for Review |
2020-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-28 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2260 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 733