TN HB1971 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, permits dependent children of active duty military and formerly active duty personnel who intend to reside in this state following active service to apply for home and community-based services. - Amends TCA Title 33, Chapter 5.
Title
As introduced, permits dependent children of active duty military and formerly active duty personnel who intend to reside in this state following active service to apply for home and community-based services. - Amends TCA Title 33, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Pitts [D] | Sen. Mark Green [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2014-01-29 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee--Government Operations for review |
2014-01-27 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-23 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2008 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-27 - P2C, ref. to S. H&W Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1971&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB1971.pdf |