TN HB1969 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 733
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 733
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires each child care agency in this state to have installed in each room of the child care agency where care is provided to children a carbon monoxide alarm that is listed according to the International Building Code and International Fire Code for the purpose of carbon monoxide detection; provides that a violation is a Class C misdemeanor and that each day on which a violation continues constitutes a separate offense. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 120 and Title 71, Chapter 3.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 68, Chapter 120 and Title 71, Chapter 3, relative to carbon monoxide alarms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 733 | |
2024-04-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-04 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-03-28 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/4/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/28/2024 |
2024-03-25 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/25/2024 |
2024-03-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Action def. in Health Committee to 3/13/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/6/2024 |
2024-02-27 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/20/2024 |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2024-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2066 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-01 - Effective date(s) 04/19/2024, 07/01/2024