TN HB1967 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-16 - Failed in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-16 - Failed in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits a person who has been convicted of certain state or federal criminal offenses from owning a business that sells firearms or firearm ammunition at retail or possessing any ownership interest in such a firearms business. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Title
As introduced, prohibits a person who has been convicted of certain state or federal criminal offenses from owning a business that sells firearms or firearm ammunition at retail or possessing any ownership interest in such a firearms business. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-16 - House - CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Failed in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-16 | House | Failed in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/16/2016 |
2016-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2016-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2016-01-21 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-01-20 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2036 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-17 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee