TN HB1962 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 733
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 733
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits the expenditure of state funds to enforce electronic logging regulations against any motor vehicle transporting nonhazardous materials for farm purposes that does not travel outside the boundaries of the state. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9 and Title 55.
Title
As enacted, prohibits the expenditure of state funds to enforce electronic logging regulations against any motor vehicle transporting nonhazardous materials for farm purposes that does not travel outside the boundaries of the state. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9 and Title 55.
Sponsors
Rep. Dale Carr [R] | Rep. Kelly Keisling [R] | Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Ron Lollar [R] |
Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Eddie Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 733 | |
2018-04-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-04 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-03-29 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/4/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/29/2018 |
2018-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/13/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2018-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-29 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1936 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 733