TN HB1959 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-13 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-13 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, provides mechanisms by which a charitable organization providing certain community services may use an official state logo or emblem for purposes of providing such services. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Section 29-34-213.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4 and Section 29-34-213, relative to charitable organizations providing community services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Government Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/13/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Action Def. in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee to 3/13/2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 2/28/2024 |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2024-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1886 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-21 - Re-refer to Senate Calendar Committee