TN HB1946 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 34-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-04 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-04 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows members of the United States armed forces and honorably discharged veterans who receive certified occupational training as a member of the United States armed forces to receive equivalent credit toward an occupational license relating to the training received. - Amends TCA Title 58; Title 62 and Title 63.
Title
As introduced, allows members of the United States armed forces and honorably discharged veterans who receive certified occupational training as a member of the United States armed forces to receive equivalent credit toward an occupational license relating to the training received. - Amends TCA Title 58; Title 62 and Title 63.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-04 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-06-02 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-06-02 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-06-02 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0603) |
2020-05-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/1/2020 |
2020-03-20 | House | Reset on Regular Cal. for 6-1-20 |
2020-03-18 | House | Reset on Regular Cal. for 3-20-19 |
2020-03-12 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/12/2020 |
2020-03-09 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/9/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Action def. in Commerce Committee to 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-18 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business Subcommittee for 2/18/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business Subcommittee of Commerce Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business Subcommittee for 2/11/2020 |
2020-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Business Subcommittee |
2020-01-30 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2020-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-28 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1915 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-02 - Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 12/1/2020