TN HB1943 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 842
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 842
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, removes early voting period for elections not held in conjunction with the August or November general election or held in conjunction with the May primary or presidential preference primary if there is no opposition for any offices on the ballot including write-in candidates; revises other election provisions. - Amends TCA Section 2-2-111(d); Section 2-4-107 and Section 2-6-102.
Title
As enacted, removes early voting period for elections not held in conjunction with the August or November general election or held in conjunction with the May primary or presidential preference primary if there is no opposition for any offices on the ballot including write-in candidates; revises other election provisions. - Amends TCA Section 2-2-111(d); Section 2-4-107 and Section 2-6-102.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 842 | |
2018-04-12 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-04-10 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/10/2018 |
2018-04-09 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/9/2018 |
2018-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2018-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2018-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-26 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2079 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-04 - Pub. Ch. 842