TN HB1942 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 716
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 716
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, permits municipalities to extend the terms of local school board members in order to comply with the general law and synchronize local elections to the general election. - Amends TCA Section 49-2-201.
Title
As enacted, permits municipalities to extend the terms of local school board members in order to comply with the general law and synchronize local elections to the general election. - Amends TCA Section 49-2-201.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-31 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-25 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-11 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-04 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-25 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-11 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-04 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | House | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 716 |
2014-03-31 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2014-03-27 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/31/2014 |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/27/2014 |
2014-03-25 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/25/2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/19/2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2014-03-11 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/11/2014 |
2014-03-04 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Education Committee |
2014-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/4/2014 |
2014-02-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee |
2014-01-29 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Committee |
2014-01-27 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-23 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2063 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-22 - Pub. Ch. 716