TN HB1940 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 798
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 798
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the department to perform certain duties, such as develop subrecipient monitoring plans utilizing analytic procedures; conduct unannounced and announced site visits of subrecipients; and conduct criminal history background checks on each applicant of the subrecipient or sponsoring organization during the application process and at any time during participation in a food program. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 9 and Title 39, Chapter 16.
Title
As enacted, requires the department to perform certain duties, such as develop subrecipient monitoring plans utilizing analytic procedures; conduct unannounced and announced site visits of subrecipients; and conduct criminal history background checks on each applicant of the subrecipient or sponsoring organization during the application process and at any time during participation in a food program. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 9 and Title 39, Chapter 16.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 798 | |
2016-03-31 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-31 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2016-03-24 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/31/2016 |
2016-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/24/2016 |
2016-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/22/2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-03-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/16/2016 |
2016-03-09 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2016-03-08 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/8/2016 |
2016-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2016-01-21 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-01-20 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1472 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 798
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1940&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB1940.pdf |