TN HB1929 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee of Education Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee of Education Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, provides a 25 percent discount on the tuition charged by a state institution of higher education to the child of an active or retired member of the Tennessee army national guard or the Tennessee air national guard. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 7.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 7, relative to tuition discounts.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Wright [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee of Education Administration |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/25/2024 |
2024-03-18 | House | Action Def. in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee to 3/25/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/18/2024 |
2024-02-12 | House | Action Def. in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee to Lottery Calendar |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 2/12/2024 |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2024-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1647 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-19 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024