TN HB1912 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - Assigned to s/c General Sub of Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - Assigned to s/c General Sub of Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates presumption that person making sale of tangible personal property to persons in this state that have been solicited by independent contractors or other representatives in Tennessee is responsible for sales tax on such sale. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 2.
Title
As introduced, creates presumption that person making sale of tangible personal property to persons in this state that have been solicited by independent contractors or other representatives in Tennessee is responsible for sales tax on such sale. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 2.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of Finance | |
2011-02-24 | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-02-23 | P1C. | |
2011-02-17 | Intro. | |
2011-02-17 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1489 (Crossfiled) 2011-03-08 - Ref. to S. Tax Sub Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1912&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB1912.pdf |