TN HB1908 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 811
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 811
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that all records containing the results of individual teacher evaluations administered pursuant to the policies, guidelines, and criteria adopted by the state board of education would be treated as confidential and would not be open to the public; specifies that the LEA, public charter school, state board of education, or department of education may access and utilize such records as required to fulfill their lawful functions. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5.
Title
As enacted, specifies that all records containing the results of individual teacher evaluations administered pursuant to the policies, guidelines, and criteria adopted by the state board of education would be treated as confidential and would not be open to the public; specifies that the LEA, public charter school, state board of education, or department of education may access and utilize such records as required to fulfill their lawful functions. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-21 - House - (VOICE VOTE) S&LG SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: State & Local Government Commit (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-21 - House - (VOICE VOTE) S&LG SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: State & Local Government Commit (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-30 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 811 | |
2012-04-05 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2012-03-29 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/5/2012 | |
2012-03-28 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/29/2012 | |
2012-03-27 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2012-03-21 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 3/27/2012 | |
2012-03-21 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2012-03-14 | Placed on s/c cal S&LG Subcommittee for 3/21/2012 | |
2012-03-14 | Sponsor change. | |
2011-03-01 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of S&LG | |
2011-02-24 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2011-02-23 | P1C. | |
2011-02-17 | Intro. | |
2011-02-17 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1447 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-30 - Pub. Ch. 811