TN HB1905 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Pub. Ch. 878
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Pub. Ch. 878
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, administratively attaches the David Crockett commission to the department of finance and administration; creates a separate account within the treasury to be used to erect a monument; authorizes state and private funds to be used to erect a monument with intent that no state funds be used until private funding exhausted. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 8, Part 4.
Title
As enacted, administratively attaches the David Crockett commission to the department of finance and administration; creates a separate account within the treasury to be used to erect a monument; authorizes state and private funds to be used to erect a monument with intent that no state funds be used until private funding exhausted. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 8, Part 4.
Sponsors
Rep. David Hawk [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Jason Powell [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | Pub. Ch. 878 | |
2018-06-01 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2018 | |
2018-05-21 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-05-16 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-05-10 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-05-10 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-05-03 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-04-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-23 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-20 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA1096) |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-04-04 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-04-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-04 | House | Passed H., Ayes 86, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-04-04 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA1007) |
2018-03-29 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/4/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/29/2018 |
2018-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/13/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2018-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-25 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1868 (Crossfiled) 2018-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 878