TN HB1902 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 922
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 922
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that a bond will remain in effect until the court renders the defendant's sentence, if the disposition of the case is a conviction or a plea of guilty; specifies that after such a disposition and before the sentence is rendered, the bond will not negatively impact the surety. - Amends TCA Section 40-11-138.
Title
As enacted, specifies that a bond will remain in effect until the court renders the defendant's sentence, if the disposition of the case is a conviction or a plea of guilty; specifies that after such a disposition and before the sentence is rendered, the bond will not negatively impact the surety. - Amends TCA Section 40-11-138.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 3 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-07 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-25 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Criminal Justice Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-07 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-25 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Criminal Justice Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-29 | House | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 922 |
2014-04-15 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2014-04-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar 3 for 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-08 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/8/2014 |
2014-04-08 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-04-08 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/8/2014 |
2014-04-07 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-04-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/8/2014 |
2014-04-02 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to next calendar |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/2/2014 |
2014-03-25 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2014-03-12 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/12/2014 |
2014-03-05 | House | Action Def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 3/12/2014 |
2014-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/5/2014 |
2014-02-25 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2014-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/25/2014 |
2014-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2014-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2014-01-23 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-22 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1952 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 922