TN HB1899 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires commissioner of revenue to report in writing to the finance, ways and means committees of the senate and the house of representatives the total annual amount of industrial machinery franchise and excise tax credits for fiscal years 2015-2020. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 20 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 21.
Title
As introduced, requires commissioner of revenue to report in writing to the finance, ways and means committees of the senate and the house of representatives the total annual amount of industrial machinery franchise and excise tax credits for fiscal years 2015-2020. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 20 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 21.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-01-30 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-27 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1863 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-11 - Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ negative recommendation, as amended