TN SB1863 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ negative recommendation, as amended
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ negative recommendation, as amended
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires commissioner of revenue to report in writing to the finance, ways and means committees of the senate and the house of representatives the total annual amount of industrial machinery franchise and excise tax credits for fiscal years 2015-2020. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 20 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 21.
Title
As introduced, requires commissioner of revenue to report in writing to the finance, ways and means committees of the senate and the house of representatives the total annual amount of industrial machinery franchise and excise tax credits for fiscal years 2015-2020. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 20 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 21.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ negative recommendation, as amended |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/11/2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Refer to Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1899 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-10 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020