TN HB1892 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-31 - Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-31 - Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits abortions from the point a fetal heartbeat is detected; requires fetal heartbeat testing prior to an abortion; creates exceptions. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 15, Part 2 and Title 68, Chapter 11, Part 2.
Title
As introduced, prohibits abortions from the point a fetal heartbeat is detected; requires fetal heartbeat testing prior to an abortion; creates exceptions. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 15, Part 2 and Title 68, Chapter 11, Part 2.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2018-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2018-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-25 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1961 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-01 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee