TN HB1890 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 717
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 717
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises the juvenile court procedures regarding service of summons and publication. - Amends TCA Title 37, Chapter 1.
Title
As enacted, revises the juvenile court procedures regarding service of summons and publication. - Amends TCA Title 37, Chapter 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 717 | |
2016-03-24 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2016-03-21 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/24/2016 |
2016-03-21 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2016-03-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/21/2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/17/2016 |
2016-03-15 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/15/2016 |
2016-03-08 | House | Action def. in Civil Justice Committee to 3/15/2016 |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/8/2016 |
2016-03-02 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/2/2016 |
2016-02-24 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/2/2016 |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/24/2016 |
2016-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2016-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2016-01-21 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-01-19 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2573 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 717
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1890&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB1890.pdf |