TN HB1887 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 789
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 789
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes off-highway vehicles to be operated on a certain segment of a state highway in Johnson County. - Amends TCA Title 11, Chapter 25; Title 54 and Title 55.
Title
As enacted, authorizes off-highway vehicles to be operated on a certain segment of a state highway in Johnson County. - Amends TCA Title 11, Chapter 25; Title 54 and Title 55.
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Hill [R] | Rep. Andy Holt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 789 | |
2020-06-17 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2020-06-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/17/2020 |
2020-06-15 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-15 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-11 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-11 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/11/2020 |
2020-06-11 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-06-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 6/11/2020 |
2020-06-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/10/2020 |
2020-06-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-06-10 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-06-08 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 6/10/2020 |
2020-06-04 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 6/4/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Infrastructure Subcommittee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-02-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Infrastructure Subcommittee |
2020-01-30 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-27 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1872 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-22 - Pub. Ch. 789