TN HB1882 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 831
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 831
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires a healthcare provider to provide to a patient or the patient’s authorized representative a full copy of the patient’s medical records within 10 working days of receipt of a written request by the patient or representative, instead of providing a full copy or a summary of the records; requires a healthcare provider to provide to a principal or an attorney in fact acting pursuant to a durable power of attorney for health care a full copy of the principal’s medical records within 10 working days of receipt of a written request by the principal or attorney in fact, instead of providing a full copy or a summary of the records. - Amends TCA Title 34; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 34; Title 63 and Title 68, relative to medical records.
Sponsors
Rep. Kip Capley [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 831 | |
2024-04-15 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-04-11 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/15/2024 |
2024-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2024 |
2024-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/3/2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2024-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1766 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-09 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024