TN HB1882 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1002
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, authorizes the Tennessee athletic commission to authorize international qualifying events for kickboxing to occur in this state as long as the events meet the standards required for such events by the World Association of Kickboxing Organizations or any subsequent entity recognized as the official kickboxing governing body by the International World Games Association. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 115.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, authorizes the Tennessee athletic commission to authorize international qualifying events for kickboxing to occur in this state as long as the events meet the standards required for such events by the World Association of Kickboxing Organizations or any subsequent entity recognized as the official kickboxing governing body by the International World Games Association. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 115.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1002
2018-04-24HouseComp. SB subst.
2018-04-18HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/23/2018
2018-04-18HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2018
2018-04-18HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2018-04-18HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/18/2018
2018-04-18HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-04-11HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/18
2018-04-04HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/13/2018
2018-04-03HousePlaced behind the budget
2018-03-28HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2018
2018-03-28HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2018-03-22HouseRe-ref. Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-03-21HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/22/2018
2018-03-14HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2018-03-07HousePlaced on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/14/2018
2018-03-06HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
2018-02-28HousePlaced on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/6/2018
2018-01-31HouseAssigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee
2018-01-29HouseP2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
2018-01-25HouseIntro., P1C.
2018-01-24HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1890 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1002

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback