TN HB1878 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-04 - Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-04 - Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, eliminates distinction between Class A and Class B donees for gift tax purposes; increases gift tax exemption by linking Tennessee to federal exemption level. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 8, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, eliminates distinction between Class A and Class B donees for gift tax purposes; increases gift tax exemption by linking Tennessee to federal exemption level. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 8, Part 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-04 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2009-02-26 | P2C, ref. to Finance | |
2009-02-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-24 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0785 (Crossfiled) 2009-03-11 - Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. to last cal.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1878&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB1878.pdf |