TN HB1868 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Passed on March 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-07 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 621
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Passed on March 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-07 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 621
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits a county election commission from utilizing instant runoff voting or ranked choice voting to conduct an election in this state for a statewide or local government office. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, relative to instant runoff voting.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Vaughan [R] | Rep. Joe Towns [D] | Rep. Barbara Cooper [D] | Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] |
Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Todd Warner [R] | Rep. Jerome Moon [R] | Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R] |
Rep. Rick Eldridge [R] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. Robin Smith [R] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] |
Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Mary Littleton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 621 | |
2022-02-14 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-02-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-10 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/14/2022 |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/10/2022 |
2022-02-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-08 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 2/8/2022 |
2022-02-02 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2022-02-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-31 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 2/2/2022 |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2022-01-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2022-01-20 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-19 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1820 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-07 - Effective date(s) 02/28/2022