TN HB1866 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-31 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-31 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows Tennessee comprehensive assessment program (TCAP) tests to be administered to students enrolled in a virtual school in an online setting; requires the department of education to ensure that TCAP tests administered to virtual school students in online settings are administered in a manner and format that does not invalidate the tests. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 16 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 16 and Title 49, Chapter 6, relative to student assessments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-31 | House | Withdrawn. |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2024-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1796 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-25 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1866&ga=113 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/113/Bill/HB1866.pdf |