TN HB1865 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires LEAs to offer high school students high school credit for a course in which the student is not enrolled but for which the student has satisfied the course requirements through an examination. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to high school credit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-04-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-03-16 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | Sponsor change. |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Education Instruction for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Action def. in Education Instruction to 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Education Instruction for 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Instruction |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction Subcommittee for 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-22 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee to 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction Subcommittee for 2/22/2022 |
2022-02-08 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee to 2/22/2022 |
2022-02-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction Subcommittee for 2/8/2022 |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee |
2022-01-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Instruction |
2022-01-20 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-19 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2663 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-14 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.