TN HB1860 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 914
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 914
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows teachers to use results from benchmark assessments, including, but not limited to, state-adopted benchmark assessments or a universal screener approved by the state board of education, to measure student achievement. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 1, relative to performance measures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 914 | |
2022-04-11 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-04-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-07 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/11/2022 |
2022-04-06 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/7/2022 |
2022-04-05 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/5/2022 |
2022-03-29 | House | Action def. in Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/5/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-03-16 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Education Instruction for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Action def. in Education Instruction to 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Education Instruction for 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Instruction |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction Subcommittee for 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-22 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee to 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction Subcommittee for 2/22/2022 |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee |
2022-01-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Instruction |
2022-01-20 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-19 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1890 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-02 - Effective date(s) 04/27/2022