TN HB1857 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 970
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 970
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the clerk in any court where electronic filing, signing, or verification of papers is authorized by court rule to assess a transaction fee for each filing submitted on an individual basis or by use of an annual subscription fee. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 21, Part 4.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the clerk in any court where electronic filing, signing, or verification of papers is authorized by court rule to assess a transaction fee for each filing submitted on an individual basis or by use of an annual subscription fee. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 21, Part 4.
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 970 | |
2016-04-11 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2016-04-07 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/11/2016 |
2016-04-06 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/7/2016 |
2016-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/22/2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/16/2016 |
2016-03-09 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2016-03-08 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/8/2016 |
2016-03-02 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/2/2016 |
2016-01-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2016-01-21 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2016-01-20 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-01-19 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1998 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 970
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1857&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB1857.pdf |