TN HB1855 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Passed on May 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1025
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Passed on May 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1025
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises the penalties for continuous sexual abuse of a child to clarify circumstances under which the offense is a Class A, Class B, or Class C felony; adds to the list of offenses that warrant the Class A felony, trafficking for a commercial sex act if the victim is a minor and promoting prostitution if the victim is a minor. - Amends TCA Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 41; Title 53 and Title 55.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 41; Title 53 and Title 55, relative to criminal law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-25 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1025 | |
2022-04-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-25 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-04-20 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/25/2022 |
2022-04-19 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-13 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-04-06 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/13/2022 |
2022-04-06 | House | Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 4/13/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-29 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/29/2022 |
2022-02-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2022-01-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-01-20 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-19 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1792 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-25 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022