TN SB1792 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-25 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-25 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises the penalties for continuous sexual abuse of a child to clarify circumstances under which the offense is a Class A, Class B, or Class C felony; adds to the list of offenses that warrant the Class A felony, trafficking for a commercial sex act if the victim is a minor and promoting prostitution if the victim is a minor. - Amends TCA Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 41; Title 53 and Title 55.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 41; Title 53 and Title 55, relative to criminal law.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. Paul Bailey [R] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] | Sen. Ferrell Haile [R] |
Sen. Paul Rose [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] | Sen. Dawn White [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-25 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2022 | |
2022-05-25 | Pub. Ch. 1025 | |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-05-02 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-04-25 | House | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-04-25 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0927) |
2022-04-25 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2022-04-14 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0903) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/13/2022 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/5/2022 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/29/2022 |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1855 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1025